Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ettore Balestrero

Permanent Observer to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva

Titular Archbishop of Victoriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1966 Born
18 Sep 199326.7Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
17 Aug 200942.6AppointedUnder Secretary of the Secretariat of State
22 Feb 201346.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
22 Feb 201346.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Victoriana
27 Apr 201346.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Victoriana
6 Jul 201851.5AppointedAdministrator to Congo, Democratic Republic of
27 Apr 201952.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Congo, Democratic Republic of
21 Jun 202356.5AppointedPermanent Observer to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva

MicroData Summary for Ettore Balestrero
(VIAF: 40610010; WikiData: Q2400453)
Archbishop Ettore Balestrero (born ) Permanent Observer of United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to United Nations Office and Specialized Agencies in Geneva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2013
  • ob/c2: MW, 5 Apr 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,774
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Apr 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 11 Jul 2024