Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Josť-Claude Mbimbi Mbamba

Bishop-Elect of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1962 Born
28 Aug 198826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
19 Mar 202158.6AppointedBishop of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Jun 202158.9Ordained BishopBishop of Boma, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Josť-Claude Mbimbi Mbamba (VIAF: 258937212)
Father Josť-Claude Mbimbi Mbamba (born ) Bishop-Elect of Boma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa
Ordained BishopBoma, Diocese of Boma

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Boma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2021
  • ob: CB, 9 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast