Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Bernard Likolo Bokal’Etumba

Bishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1967 Born
30 May 199931.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kinshasa, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
15 Feb 202153.4AppointedBishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
29 May 202153.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lisala, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Bernard Likolo Bokal’Etumba
Bishop Joseph-Bernard Likolo Bokal’Etumba (born ) Bishop of Lisala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKinshasa, Archdiocese of Kinshasa
Ordained BishopOutdoors, Near, Saint-Hermès, Cathedral, Lisala, Diocese of Lisala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lisala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2021
  • ob: CB, 11 Mar 2021
  • c2+: CB, 29 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 May 2021

Quantcast