Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Colombia



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luis Mariano Montemayor, Apostolic Nuncio

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Established: 26 November 1835
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Colombia
  • Mailing Address: Apartado Aereo 3740, Carrera 15, N. 36-33, Bogota, Colobia
  • Telephone: (57-1)7449-111
  • Fax: 3907-152

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
26 November 1835EstablishedNunciature to Colombia
17 May 1881RestoredNunciature to Colombia
20 July 1917ElevatedNunciature to Colombia (to Nunciature)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.6, 16 Apr 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast