Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Raffaele Zampetti

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1819Born
18 Dec 184122.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jul 187556.3AppointedBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
11 Jul 187556.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli e Pergola, Italy
29 Sep 187657.5AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
23 Nov 187859.6DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Raffaele Zampetti (VIAF: 89475992)
Bishop Luigi Raffaele Zampetti (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelfidardo
Ordained BishopS. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 122, and Page 172
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1875, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Mar 2017