Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germano Zaccheo

Deceased

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1934Born
29 Jun 195823.8Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 199560.7AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
16 Sep 199561.0Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
20 Nov 200773.2DiedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Germano Zaccheo (VIAF: 67617333)
Bishop Germano Zaccheo (born , died ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCannobio

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,611
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast