Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Neil E. Willard

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Tisedi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1937Born
27 May 196124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
27 Jun 199558.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
27 Jun 199558.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tisedi
15 Aug 199558.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tisedi
25 Mar 199860.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Neil E. Willard
Bishop Neil E. Willard (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Basilica, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Death PlaceMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Buried Place (Original)Mary, Queen of the World, Cathedral, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,579
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast