Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ricardo José Weberberger, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1939Born
18 Aug 195919.9ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Aug 196424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 May 197939.7AppointedBishop of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil
11 Jul 197939.8Ordained BishopBishop of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil
17 Aug 201070.9DiedBishop of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ricardo José Weberberger
Bishop Ricardo José Weberberger O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Barreiras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeonfelde, Austria

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 8 Jul 2017