Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert van Overbeke, C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bayombong, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1915Born
4 Aug 194024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
18 Nov 196650.9AppointedPrelate of Bayombong, Philippines
10 Sep 196953.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Caliabria
30 Nov 196954.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caliabria
18 Feb 197862.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Caliabria
15 Nov 198266.9AppointedBishop of Bayombong, Philippines
15 Sep 198670.8ResignedBishop of Bayombong, Philippines
16 Jun 198771.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Bayombong, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Albert van Overbeke
Bishop Albert van Overbeke C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayombong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOostrozebeke, Belgium
Ordained BishopSanto Domingo, Church, Bayombong, Territorial Prelature of Bayombong

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 440

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast