Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Versiani Velloso

Deceased

Bishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1919Born
25 Oct 194223.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 196647.4AppointedBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil
25 Jan 196747.6Ordained BishopBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil
17 May 197252.9DiedBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Versiani Velloso
Bishop José Francisco Versiani Velloso (born , died ) Bishop of Itumbiara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAuro Preto

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018