Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gisleno Veneri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Acquapendente, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Darnis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1844Born
15 Jun 186722.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 188742.6AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
5 Jun 188742.7Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
15 Dec 191975.2RetiredBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
15 Dec 191975.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Darnis
15 Nov 193793.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Acquapendente, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gisleno Veneri
Archbishop Gisleno Veneri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Acquapendente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Marcello, Diocese of Jesi
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 70.4 years
  • a bishop for 50.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017