Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Patricio Vega Velasco, S.V.D.

Bishop of Valparaíso, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1957 Born
1 Mar 198325.7ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
22 Dec 198427.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
20 Feb 201052.6AppointedPrelate of Illapel, Chile
17 Apr 201052.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Illapel, Chile
30 Apr 201052.8InstalledPrelate of Illapel, Chile
8 Jun 202163.9AppointedBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
15 Jul 202164.0InstalledBishop of Valparaíso, Chile

MicroData Summary for Jorge Patricio Vega Velasco
Bishop Jorge Patricio Vega Velasco S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Valparaíso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valparaíso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,625
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2021
  • c1: CB, 8 Jun 2021
  • i: CB, 19 Jun 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Jun 2021

Quantcast