Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Eduardo Pellegrín Barrera, S.V.D.

Bishop of Chillán, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1958 Born
23 Apr 197819.7ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
9 Nov 198527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
25 Mar 200647.6AppointedBishop of Chillán, Chile
29 Apr 200647.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chillán, Chile

MicroData Summary for Carlos Eduardo Pellegrín Barrera
Bishop Carlos Eduardo Pellegrín Barrera S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Chillán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chillán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018