Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Kalu Ukpong

Auxiliary Bishop of Umuahia, Nigeria

Titular Bishop of Igilgili


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1964 Born
7 Aug 199328.6Ordained PriestPriest of Umuahia, Nigeria
30 May 202055.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Umuahia, Nigeria
30 May 202055.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Igilgili
30 Jul 202055.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Igilgili

MicroData Summary for Michael Kalu Ukpong
Bishop Michael Kalu Ukpong (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Umuahia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmaekpu Ohafia, Diocese of Umuahia
Ordained BishopMater Dei, Cathedral, Umuahia, Diocese of Umuahia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Umuahia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 2 Jul 2020
  • c2+: CB, 30 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Aug 2020

Quantcast