Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ascanio Turamini

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586¹BornSenis
2 Mar 163751.2AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
15 Mar 163751.2Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
2 Sep 164761.7DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Turamini:
Bishop Ascanio Turamini (died ) Bishop of Grosseto

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 198
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 98, Number 591

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013