Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Tiberio

Deceased

Bishop of Diano-Teggiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1850BornCasalbordino
14 Nov 190656.1AppointedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
25 Nov 190656.1Ordained BishopBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
26 Apr 191564.5DiedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Tiberio:
Bishop Camillo Tiberio (born , died ) Bishop of Diano-Teggiano

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013