Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Sahaya Thatheus Thomas

Bishop-Elect of Simla and Chandigarh, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1971 Born
13 May 200129.5Ordained PriestPriest of Simla and Chandigarh, India
12 Apr 202553.4AppointedBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India
13 May 202553.5Ordained BishopBishop of Simla and Chandigarh, India

MicroData Summary
Sahaya Thatheus Thomas
Father Sahaya Thatheus Thomas
(born )
Bishop-Elect of Simla and Chandigarh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChinnavilai, Diocese of Kottar
Ordained BishopPrarthana Bhawan, Kauli

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Simla and Chandigarh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2025
  • opd: CB, 15 Apr 2025
  • ob: CB, 1 May 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 2 May 2025