Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Anthony Teuma

Bishop-Elect of Gozo, Malta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1964 Born
25 Jun 198824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gozo, Malta
17 Jun 202056.4AppointedBishop of Gozo, Malta
13 Sep 202056.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gozo, Malta

MicroData Summary for Anthony Teuma
Father Anthony Teuma (born ) Bishop-Elect of Gozo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceXaghra, Diocese of Gozo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Victoria, Diocese of Gozo

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Gozo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jun 2020
  • ob: CB, 7 Jul 2020
  • c2: CB, 8 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 9 Jul 2020

Quantcast