Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio Vittorio Terrinoni, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Avezzano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1914Born
3 Mar 194026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
17 Apr 197157.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roma {Rome}, Italy
17 Apr 197157.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ferentium
19 May 197157.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ferentium
22 Apr 197763.1AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
23 Jun 199076.3RetiredBishop of Avezzano, Italy
15 Apr 199682.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Avezzano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Biagio Vittorio Terrinoni
Bishop Biagio Vittorio Terrinoni O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Avezzano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFiuggi

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 27 Sep 2018

Quantcast