Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Santucci

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trivento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1928Born
1 Jul 195122.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 198556.5AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
22 Jun 198556.6Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
17 Oct 200576.9RetiredBishop of Trivento, Italy
26 Sep 201889.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Santucci
Bishop Antonio Santucci (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trivento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagliano
Death PlaceMagliano dei Marsi

  • a priest for 67.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Oct 2005
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 26 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 27 Sep 2018

Quantcast