Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo José Tavares

Deceased

Bishop of Macau, China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1920Born
24 Apr 194323.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 196141.5AppointedBishop of Macau, China
21 Sep 196141.6Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
12 Jun 197353.3DiedBishop of Macau, China

MicroData Summary for Paulo José Tavares
Bishop Paulo José Tavares (born , died ) Bishop of Macau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRabo de Peixe

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018