Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Martin Tapsoba, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ouahigouya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1916BornOuagadougou
6 May 194427.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
15 Mar 196649.7AppointedBishop of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
16 Oct 196650.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
8 Nov 198468.3ResignedBishop of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso
13 Mar 200891.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ouahigouya, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Denis Martin Tapsoba:
Bishop Denis Martin Tapsoba M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ouahigouya

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013