Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Taberner (Taverner) Dárdena

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1670BornBarcelona
16 Dec 172050.6AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
1 May 172151.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
16 Jan 172655.7DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Taberner (Taverner) Dárdena:
Bishop José Taberner (Taverner) Dárdena (born , died ) Bishop of Gerona

  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,069
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013