Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emílio Sumbelelo

Bishop of Viana, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1964 Born
4 Aug 199127.4Ordained PriestPriest of Benguela, Angola
1 Dec 200642.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Uije, Angola
25 Feb 200742.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Uije, Angola
2 Feb 200843.9SucceededBishop of Uije, Angola
11 Feb 201954.9AppointedBishop of Viana, Angola
28 Apr 201955.1InstalledBishop of Viana, Angola

MicroData Summary for Emílio Sumbelelo
Bishop Emílio Sumbelelo (born ) Bishop of Viana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCubal
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora dos Navegantes, Chapel, Benguela, Diocese of Benguela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Viana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,340
  • s: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2019
  • i: AM, 8 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Apr 2019

Quantcast