Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Uije

Dioecesis Uiiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 16 May 1979
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Malanje
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Angola
  • Square Kilometers: 63,467 (24,514 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, C.P. 239, Uije, Angola
  • Telephone: 233.222.650

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Carmona e São Salvador
14 March 1967ErectedArchdiocese of Luanda Diocese of Carmona e São Salvador (erected)
Diocese of Uije
16 May 1979Name ChangedDiocese of Carmona e São Salvador Diocese of Uije
7 November 1984Territory LostDiocese of Uije Diocese of Mbanza Congo (erected)
12 April 2011Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Uije (from Luanda)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Carmona e São Salvador
1970440,183.0%12930038523ap1971
Diocese of Uije
1980289,600837,00034.6%1242511,584313818ap1981
1990419,9061,252,47333.5%7222914,479366415ap1991
1999552,5291,405,56939.3%14173117,823247915ap2000
2000558,9081,412,11839.6%14142819,961208515ap2001
2001563,5301,410,73539.9%16132919,432208414ap2002
2002558,1061,268,02244.0%16132919,245207915ap2003
2003556,6971,252,27044.5%20133316,869237715ap2004
2004566,7131,290,00043.9%26174313,179238216ap2005
2010813,0001,588,00051.2%35155016,260256620ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 28 Aug 2013