Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Suren Gomes, S.D.B.

Bishop of Krishnagar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1944 BornAshnabad
21 Dec 197430.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Apr 200258.2AppointedBishop of Krishnagar, India
31 May 200258.3Ordained BishopBishop of Krishnagar, India

MicroData Summary for Joseph Suren Gomes:
Bishop Joseph Suren Gomes S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Krishnagar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Krishnagar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,194

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013