Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Strobino

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1856Born
19 Jun 189135.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa
19 Jun 189135.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
1 Nov 189135.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
30 Nov 189337.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa
1 Oct 189640.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Pietro Strobino
Bishop Pietro Strobino (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMosso Santa Maria, Italy
Ordained BishopLe Cap, Port Elizabeth

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 462
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1891, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018