Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James David Ricards

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Rhithymna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1828Born
1850¹21.9Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 187143.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa
13 Jan 187143.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
18 Jun 187143.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhithymna
30 Nov 189365.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}, South Africa

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James David Ricards
Bishop James David Ricards (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Eastern District {Capo de Buona Speranza, Distretto Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWexford, Ireland
Ordained BishopSaint Patrick, Grahamstown

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 481
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,734
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017