Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Gaetano Secondo Stella

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay

Titular Bishop of Amyzon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1857Born
8 Apr 188224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
22 Dec 189336.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
22 Dec 189336.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyzon
24 Nov 189437.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyzon
21 Sep 192770.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Montevideo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Pio Gaetano Secondo Stella
Bishop Pio Gaetano Secondo Stella (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Montevideo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaso del Molino, Diocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montevideo, Diocese of Montevideo

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,913
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 97
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 53
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,894, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast