Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Delmiro Encarnación Soler Vidal

Deceased

Archbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1846Born
21 Dec 187226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Montevideo, Uruguay
29 Jan 189144.8AppointedBishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
8 Feb 189144.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
19 Apr 189751.0AppointedArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay
26 Sep 190862.5DiedArchbishop of Montevideo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for Mariano Delmiro Encarnación Soler Vidal (VIAF: 89489129)
Archbishop Mariano Delmiro Encarnación Soler Vidal (born , died ) Archbishop of Montevideo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Carlo, Diocese of Montevideo
Ordained BishopCollege Pio Latino, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • c2+/b: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 395
  • name: CB, 13 Oct 2016
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,891, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast