Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emile-Joseph Socquet, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso

Titular Archbishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1905Born
2 Jun 192822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
8 Jan 194842.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
8 Jan 194842.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
4 Jun 194842.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
16 Sep 194944.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
14 Sep 195550.2AppointedArchbishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
12 Jan 196054.5ResignedArchbishop of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso
12 Jan 196054.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
16 Jul 198782.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ouagadougou, Burkina Faso

MicroData Summary for Emile-Joseph Socquet
Archbishop Emile-Joseph Socquet M. Afr. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ouagadougou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrest-Voland, France

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017