Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Noel Saw Naw Aye

Auxiliary Bishop of Yangon, Myanmar

Titular Bishop of Methamaucum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1969 Born
18 Mar 199526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Yangon, Myanmar
10 Nov 202051.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Yangon, Myanmar
10 Nov 202051.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Methamaucum
14 Feb 202152.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methamaucum

MicroData Summary for Noel Saw Naw Aye
Bishop Noel Saw Naw Aye (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Yangon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaukwaigyi Village, Archdiocese of Rangoon
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cathedral, Yangon, Archdiocese of Yangon

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Yangon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Jan 2021
  • c34: CB, 14 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Feb 2021

Quantcast