Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugh Patrick Slattery, M.S.C.

Bishop Emeritus of Tzaneen, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1934 Born
16 Jul 195824.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
22 Jun 198450.2AppointedBishop of Louis Trichardt-Tzaneen, South Africa
30 Sep 198450.5Ordained BishopBishop of Louis Trichardt-Tzaneen, South Africa
28 Jan 201075.8RetiredBishop of Tzaneen, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Hugh Patrick Slattery
Bishop Hugh Patrick Slattery M.S.C. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tzaneen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNenagh, Ireland
Ordained BishopS. Brendan, Louis Trichardt, Diocese of Leiria, Portugal

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tzaneen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,414
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast