Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zef Simoni

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of ShkodrŽ-Pult

Titular Bishop of Bararus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1928BornShkodrŽ
9 Feb 196132.2Ordained PriestPriest of ShkodrŽ, Albania
25 Dec 199264.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of ShkodrŽ, Albania
25 Dec 199264.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bararus
25 Apr 199364.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bararus
20 Jan 200475.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of ShkodrŽ, Albania
21 Feb 200980.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of ShkodrŽ, Albania

MicroData Summary for Zef Simoni:
Bishop Zef Simoni (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of ShkodrŽ-Pult

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,070
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013