Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Sfair

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Nisibis dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1888BornKlaihat
8 Mar 191325.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Mar 195365.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria
24 May 195365.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Syria
11 Mar 196072.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis dei Maroniti
18 May 197486.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis dei Maroniti

MicroData Summary for Pietro Sfair:
Archbishop Pietro Sfair (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Nisibis dei Maroniti

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 20 Dec 2014