Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Igino Maria Serci Vaquer

Deceased

Bishop of Ozieri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1884Born
2 Feb 193449.7AppointedBishop of Ozieri, Italy
22 Apr 193450.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ozieri, Italy
30 May 193854.1DiedBishop of Ozieri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Igino Maria Serci Vaquer
Bishop Igino Maria Serci Vaquer (born , died ) Bishop of Ozieri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNuraminis

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018