Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aplinar Senapati, C.M.

Bishop of Rayagada, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1960 Born
10 May 198423.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
10 May 198928.5Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Mission
28 Nov 199030.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
11 Apr 201655.4AppointedBishop of Rayagada, India
28 May 201655.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rayagada, India

MicroData Summary for Aplinar Senapati
Bishop Aplinar Senapati C.M. (born ) Bishop of Rayagada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSurada

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rayagada.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2016
  • ob/c23: CB, 28 May 2016
  • c4: CB, 2 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,924

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast