Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Scharnagl

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1877Born
29 Jun 190123.6Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
10 Apr 194365.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
10 Apr 194365.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
9 May 194365.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Isauria
19 Jan 195577.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anton Scharnagl
Bishop Anton Scharnagl (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of München und Freising {Munich}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünchen

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast