Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Luís Guido Scarpa, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ndalatando, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1925Born
26 Mar 195025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Jul 198358.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luanda, Angola
22 Jul 198358.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cursola
16 Oct 198358.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cursola
26 Mar 199065.1AppointedBishop of Ndalatando, Angola
23 Jul 200580.4RetiredBishop of Ndalatando, Angola
20 Oct 201893.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ndalatando, Angola

MicroData Summary for Pedro Luís Guido Scarpa
Bishop Pedro Luís Guido Scarpa O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ndalatando

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Death PlaceLuanda, Archdiocese of Luanda

  • a priest for 68.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2005
  • d: CB, 20 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast