Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Arsenio Saporito

Auxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Luperciana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1962 Born
30 May 199230.0Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Feb 202057.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Feb 202057.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Luperciana
30 Jun 202058.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Luperciana

MicroData Summary for Michael Arsenio Saporito
Bishop Michael Arsenio Saporito (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Newark

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral Basilica, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Newark.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2020
  • mn/ob/c2: CB, 27 Feb 2020
  • ob: CB, 18 May 2020
  • c34: CB, 26 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Jul 2020

Quantcast