Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Salerno

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

Titular Bishop of Caere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1928Born
16 Mar 195223.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 199769.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Caere
20 Dec 199769.3AppointedSecretary of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
6 Jan 199869.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caere
23 Oct 199870.1AppointedSecretary of the Apostolic Signatura
30 Dec 200375.3RetiredSecretary of the Apostolic Signatura
21 Jan 201788.4DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Salerno (VIAF: 304916982)
Bishop Francesco Saverio Salerno (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaserta, Italy

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,189
  • d: CB, 21 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 13 Sep 2017