Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pie Armand Pierre Sabadel, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Corinthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1850BornLangogne
22 May 187524.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Nov 191161.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Corinthus
17 Dec 191161.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corinthus
4 May 191463.5DiedTitular Bishop of Corinthus

MicroData Summary for Pie Armand Pierre Sabadel:
Bishop Pie Armand Pierre Sabadel O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Corinthus

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 141
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013