Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Ródenas García

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1895Born
19 Mar 192125.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 194751.3AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
13 Jul 194751.5Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
7 Nov 196569.8DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Ródenas García
Bishop Alfonso Ródenas García (born , died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBullas

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast