Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abílio Rodas de Sousa Ribas, C.S.Sp.

Bishop Emeritus of São Tomé e Príncipe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1931 BornVárzea de Soajo
21 Sep 195726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
3 Dec 198453.9AppointedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
24 Feb 198554.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
1 Dec 200675.9RetiredBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe

MicroData Summary for Abílio Rodas de Sousa Ribas:
Bishop Abílio Rodas de Sousa Ribas C.S.Sp. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of São Tomé e Príncipe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of São Tomé e Príncipe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013