Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Douglas Regattieri

Bishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1949 Born
15 Sep 197323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Carpi, Italy
8 Oct 201061.0AppointedBishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy
28 Nov 201061.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy
12 Dec 201061.1InstalledBishop of Cesena-Sarsina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Douglas Regattieri
Bishop Douglas Regattieri (born ) Bishop of Cesena-Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallalta di Concordia, Diocese of Carpi
Ordained PriestVallalta, Diocese of Carpi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Carpi, Diocese of Carpi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Cesena-Sarsina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,866

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Mar 2018