Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fidelis Rakotonarivo, S.J.

Bishop of Ambositra, Madagascar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1956 Born
15 Aug 199235.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
24 Jun 200548.8AppointedBishop of Ambositra, Madagascar
4 Sep 200549.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ambositra, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for Fidelis Rakotonarivo
Bishop Fidelis Rakotonarivo S.J. (born ) Bishop of Ambositra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAmbohimahazo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ambositra.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,971

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018