Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guire Poulard

Archbishop of Port-au-Prince


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1942 BornDelatte
25 Jun 197230.5Ordained PriestPriest of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
25 Feb 198846.1AppointedBishop of Jacmel, Haïti
15 May 198846.4Ordained BishopBishop of Jacmel, Haïti
9 Mar 200967.2AppointedBishop of Les Cayes, Haïti
12 Jan 201169.0AppointedArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
26 Mar 201169.2InstalledArchbishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Guire Poulard:
Archbishop Guire Poulard (born ) Archbishop of Port-au-Prince

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,720

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Jun 2014