Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Quesnel Alphonse, S.M.M.

Bishop of Fort-Liberté, Haïti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1949 Born
1972²22.0ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
16 Jul 197727.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
Oct 1977³27.8Perpetual VowsPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
10 Nov 201262.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
10 Nov 201262.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
22 Dec 201263.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysiana
25 Oct 201464.8AppointedBishop of Fort-Liberté, Haïti
13 Dec 201465.0InstalledBishop of Fort-Liberté, Haïti

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Quesnel Alphonse
Bishop Quesnel Alphonse S.M.M. (born ) Bishop of Fort-Liberté

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort-au-Prince

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fort-Liberté.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 Nov 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,615
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2014
  • i: CB, 30 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast