Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josť Manuel Plaza de la Tejera, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1772BornRiobamba
1795¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest
1802¹30.0ProfessedPriest of Order of Friars Minor
3 Jul 184876.5AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
22 Sep 185381.7DiedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josť Manuel Plaza de la Tejera:
Bishop Josť Manuel Plaza de la Tejera O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a priest for 58.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 221

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013