Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Antony Pillai

Bishop of Tuticorin, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1952 Born
7 May 197926.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vellore, India
17 Jan 201966.5AppointedBishop of Tuticorin, India
24 Feb 201966.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tuticorin, India

MicroData Summary for Stephen Antony Pillai
Bishop Stephen Antony Pillai (born ) Bishop of Tuticorin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKeezha Manakudy, Diocese of Kottar
Ordained BishopOpen Air, In Front of, Cathedral, Tuticorin, Diocese of Tuticorin

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tuticorin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2019
  • ob: CB, 19 Jan 2019
  • c2+: CB, 24 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 27 Feb 2019

Quantcast